BURNT ASH PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.A

Charity number: 1052481
Charity reporting is overdue by 1286 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016
Total gross income £11.87k £12.00k £11.11k £11.11k £13.44k
Total expenditure £16.32k £7.00k £7.55k £7.55k £9.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0