Accounts and annual returns THE ORR MACKINTOSH FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1052686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window