DEVON LINK-UP

Charity number: 1052687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £148.00k £106.14k £107.27k £117.98k £332.21k
Total expenditure £152.17k £104.20k £89.68k £112.79k £249.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A