WOMEN'S INSTITUTE NEWICK GREEN
Charity Number: 1052832
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve and develop conditions of rural life in accordance with the constitution and rules of the Women's Institute.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
Total income: £401
Total expenditure: £4,051
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- East Sussex
Governance
Registration history:
- 12 February 1996: Standard registration
- 17 January 2023: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £1.24k | £1.90k | £36.74k | £401 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27k | £1.27k | £1.10k | £1.08k | £4.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED --- IN PRACTICE NEWICK
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window