ST. MARY'S FABRIC FUND ELSENHAM

Charity number: 1052884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.09k £13.50k £9.78k £8.96k £14.40k
Total expenditure £691 £20.81k £626 £15.82k £15.03k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A