Accounts and annual returns DARITE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1052937
Charity reporting is overdue by 247 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 247 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 247 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 21 June 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 21 June 2021 447 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 09 April 2021 740 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required