IZON PEOPLE'S ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Izon People's Association activities are focused on the welfare and development of Izon People in the UK and partnership with Izon People abroad. The activities include holding classes, seminars and conferences, welfare visits and leisure activities, raising awareness of important issues, exchange trips abroad, work with Niger Delta organisations worldwide. Focus on Young people and elders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 February 1996: Standard registration
- 04 October 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.70k | £0 | £550 | £1.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.70k | £0 | £540 | £930 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(A)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY MEANS OF PROVIDING TRAINING FACILITIES FOR COMPUTER SKILLS AND OTHER RE-TRAINING FACILITIES OR PROGRAMMES TO ENHANCE THE EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES OF THOSE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED; (B)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY THE IZON COMMUNITY INCLUDING OTHER ETHNIC MINORITIES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITES FOR SELF-FULFILMENT THROUGH SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION; (C)TO RELEIVE NEED GENERALLY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION FOR THE HOMELESS, PARTICULARLY THE IZON PEOPLE, BY OFFERING ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND INFORMATION IN HOUSING MATTERS FOR THE COMMUNITY; (D)TO RELIEVE BY MEANS OF PROVIDING CARE FOR THE ELDERLY PEOPLE GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THE NEEDS OF THE IZON COMMUNITY; (E)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY THE EDUCATION OF ZION YOUTHS WITHIN THE INNER CITY AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES IN ORDER THAT BSUCH PERSONS MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AND CONTRIBUTE POSITIVELY TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF SOCIETY; AND (F)TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTING PERSONS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED, PARTICULARLY THOSE OF THE IZON COMMUNITY BY MEANS OF COUNSELLING AND ALSO BY VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN AREAS OF PHOTOGRAPHY, FASHION DESIGN, PLUMBING, WOODWORK, COMPUTER MAINTENANCE AND DESK-TOP PUBLISHING AND SO FORTH WHICH WILL ENABLE SUCH UNEMPLOYED PERSONS TO REALISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND BY ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO ENTER THE SUSTAINABLE SELF-EMPLOYMENT SECTOR IN THE ECONOMY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window