Financial history THE JOHN FISHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052985
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £15.00k £16.43k £23.93k £29.08k £40.07k
Total expenditure £33.34k £958 £14.44k £4.58k £50.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A