Financial history ASSOCIATION OF HADRIAN ACADEMY

Charity number: 1053006
Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.16k £8.87k £12.51k £6.29k £39
Total expenditure £1.90k £10.64k £1.69k £4.40k £1.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A