Trustees YORK GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS
Charity Number: 1053044

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Grant | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Thurlow | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CHARLES LAWSON Treasurer | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Jefferson Secretary | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Edward Goring | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Kemp Chair | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER JOHN WEST | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JIM BOAM | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.