SOUTH INDIAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social and cultural events catering to the needs of South Indian community in the London and neighbouring areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 February 1996: Standard registration
- S I S (Working name)
- SOUTH INDIAN SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr VENKATARAMA SUBRAMANIAN | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sripathy Saminathan | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Srikanth Balasubramanian | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nandhini Gowrishankar | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pavithra Vaidyanathan | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Padma Krishnamurthy | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
NATARAJAN Ganesan | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.02k | £6.26k | £5.29k | £4.01k | £3.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.97k | £3.33k | £2.90k | £3.65k | £2.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 November 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF SOUTH INDIAN VEDIC CULTURE INCLUDING LANGUAGE RELIGION AND THE ARTS PARTICULARLY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER 21 YEARS OF AGE. (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE SOUTH INDIAN FAMILIES BY MAKING A DONATION TOWARDS MARRIAGE RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL EXPENSES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Willow Close
HORNCHURCH
Essex
RM12 4QR
- Phone:
- 07531519900
- Email:
- sisnambalava@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window