THE RACE EQUALITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide advice, advocacy, support to all communities in Leicester to address issues related to racial inequality, discrimination and harassment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £60,246 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 22 February 1996: Standard registration
- LEICESTER & LEICESTERSHIRE RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL (Previous name)
- LEICESTER RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURINDER SHARMA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kirk Master | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sherilyn Pereira | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tahera Khan | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mokhtar Hussain | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Gail Pringle | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wajeeda Yusuf | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Solanki | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Camille London-Miyo | Trustee | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ashok Mohindra | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CANON IRVING RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHRYN JANE HART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.70k | £531.07k | £414.03k | £225.86k | £285.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.60k | £331.43k | £304.44k | £287.88k | £394.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.53k | N/A | £60.25k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £5.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £531.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £331.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 APRIL 2004, 6 APRIL 2004, 12 MAY 2005 AND 3 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
(1) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION; (2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. (3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST IMMIGRANTS AND REFUGEES PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highfield Youth & Community Centre
1st Floor
96 Melbourne Road
LEICESTER
- Phone:
- 01162042790
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window