WORTHING SHOPMOBILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charityÔÇÖs objects are to help relieve the suffering and social exclusion of people with restricted mobility, resulting from age, sickness, disability or other causes by the provision of powered scooters, wheelchairs and other equipment, and of other services to help improve their mobility and conditions of life and improve their physical and mental well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 March 1996: Standard registration
- 11 June 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.99k | £79.08k | £44.30k | £42.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.67k | £81.37k | £39.63k | £37.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 04 February 2009 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 17 June 2008 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 20 February 2008 | 20 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 08 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 08 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 04 May 2006 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 22 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 22 July 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 FEBRUARY 1996 AND AS AMENDED 7 JULY 1999 , 24 JANUARY 2003 AND 23 MAY 2006 .
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH RESTRICTED MOBILITY RESULTING FROM AGE, SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR OTHER CAUSES ( WHETHER OF A TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT NATURE), BY THE PROVISION OF POWERED SCOOTERS, WHEELCHAIRS AND OTHER EQUIPMENT, AND OF OTHER SERVICES TO IMPROVE THEIR MOBILITY AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window