WEST THORPE PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £87,462 from 87462 government contract(s) and £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 26 February 1996: Standard registration
- WEST THORPE PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Rhodes | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Dinsdale | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Cooke | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Noble | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE CHITTOCK | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.98k | £92.45k | £81.99k | £101.87k | £118.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.38k | £93.44k | £90.87k | £100.57k | £115.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £87.46k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEBRUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 13 OCTOBER 1993 AND 6 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST THORPE METHODIST CHURCH
WEST THORPE
YORK
YO24 2PN
- Phone:
- 07934421390
- Email:
- westthorpe@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window