Financial history WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT CARERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1053295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £608.69k £758.48k £648.93k £677.14k £746.83k
Total expenditure £676.97k £670.28k £634.36k £714.48k £709.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £601.93k £757.78k £647.13k £664.29k £742.96k
Income - Donations and legacies £607.88k £528 £1.52k £1.98k £1.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £674.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £804 £172 £286 £951 £951
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £676.97k £670.28k £634.36k £714.48k £709.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £2.41k £3.61k £3.16k £3.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0