Trustees WEST TOWN PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1053421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Izabela Wozniak | Chair | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fakhra Kousar | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grazyna Gruchel | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ismat Nawaz | Trustee | 16 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULANTA AHMED | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Munawar Bi | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
GERALDINE POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.