Financial history MARTHA TRUST HEREFORD LIMITED

Charity number: 1053448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.89m £3.93m £4.13m £4.22m £4.39m
Total expenditure £3.54m £3.59m £3.96m £4.42m £4.10m
Income from government contracts £3.78m N/A £4.05m £3.98m £4.30m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £211.65k £74.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £55.30k £19.54k £16.45k £233.38k £15.39k
Income - Other trading activities £41.85k £43.10k £39.17k £102 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.78m £3.85m £4.05m £3.98m £4.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.80k £17.59k £22.49k £6.60k £2.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £74.13k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.53m £3.58m £3.95m £4.42m £4.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.83k £12.75k £12.28k £1.69k £0
Expenditure - Governance £28.08k £23.87k £0 £21.27k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0