TAVISTOCK COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1053469
Charity reporting is 34 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not yet received
34 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not yet received
34 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)