Financial history ROYAL BROMPTON AND HAREFIELD HOSPITALS CHARITY

Charity number: 1053584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.56m £8.14m £8.39m £8.05m £9.35m
Total expenditure £11.30m £9.59m £9.85m £7.80m £9.80m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.78m £4.24m £4.23m £3.58m £6.01m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £506.00k £116.00k £28.00k £28.00k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.27m £3.79m £4.14m £4.44m £3.34m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £274.00k £783.00k £870.00k £309.00k £437.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.61m £6.27m £6.49m £4.00m £6.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.77m £2.18m £2.10m £2.56m £2.15m
Expenditure - Governance £133.00k £72.00k £130.00k £98.00k £64.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.37m £5.00m £0 £3.40m £6.00m
Expenditure - Investment management £989.00k £1.40m £1.22m £1.32m £1.25m
Expenditure - Other £920.00k £1.14m £1.26m £1.25m £930.00k