Trustees ROYAL BROMPTON AND HAREFIELD HOSPITALS CHARITY

Charity number: 1053584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Ann Julia Winter Trustee 14 April 2022
None on record
Priya Ponnaiyah Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Donald Wootton Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Stuart Corbyn Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
Paul Oldershaw Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record
Helen Margaret Putter Trustee 21 June 2018
None on record
Brenda Vandamme Trustee 10 November 2016
HARVARD HOUSE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Joanne Louise Thomas Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
Raj Rashmikant Shah Trustee 10 March 2016
None on record
Caroline Bault Trustee 01 December 2015
None on record