NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS

Charity number: 1053715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £8.51k £8.84k £13.73k £10.44k £10.91k
Total expenditure £4.00k £5.92k £6.07k £8.89k £7.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A