ST THOMAS MORE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (DERBYSHIRE)

Charity number: 1053754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required