COMMUNITY ACTION HAMPSHIRE

Charity number: 1053806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £965.06k £970.53k £993.71k £944.49k £935.39k
Total expenditure £1.13m £1.07m £1.44m £1.27m £1.29m
Income from government contracts £115.45k £15.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £376.96k £321.55k £278.28k £287.93k £244.85k
Income - Donations and legacies £162.43k £80.50k £80.50k £72.44k £57.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £684.06k £770.18k £793.87k £770.29k £700.41k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £118.57k £119.85k £119.34k £101.77k £177.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.04m £1.42m £1.25m £1.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.49k £24.25k £24.10k £21.83k £23.74k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0