INTERACT PERFORMANCE GROUP (HARROGATE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a service in Drama/Music for people with learning difficulties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 March 1996: Standard registration
- ELECTRIC RAINBOW ARTS (Previous name)
- ELECTRIC RAINBOW ARTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY SCURR | Chair | 15 March 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.74k | £2.48k | £2.64k | £2.02k | £2.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.97k | £3.26k | £2.59k | £2.48k | £2.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 April 2021 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND IN PURSUANCE OF THAT OBJECT TO PROVIDE TRAINING FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES IN THE COMPOSITION AND PERFORMANCE OF MUSIC AND IN BACKSTAGE SKILLS REQUIRED TO PUT ON MUSICAL AND OTHER EVENTS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3.2)AND 3) OF MEMORANDUM
Area of benefit
NORTH YORKSHIRE OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 WOODLANDS DRIVE
HARROGATE
HG2 7AX
- Phone:
- 07940873217
- Email:
- me.scurr@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window