Accounts and annual returns SOUTH LONDON CONGOLESE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1053836
Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 8 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 8 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 373 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 373 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 December 2020 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 December 2020 691 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required