Financial history GRAND BAY (UK) DOMINICA COMMUNITY ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1053840
Charity reporting is overdue by 880 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £17.39k £16.25k £14.50k £16.47k £11.08k
Total expenditure £5.20k £8.50k £5.50k £5.52k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A