Financial history GARRETT'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1053847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.42k £27.46k £10.40k £13.08k £13.87k
Total expenditure £1.51k £4.47k £9.80k £7.25k £7.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k £1.00k £2.83k £4.00k