Family Fund Trust

Charity number: 1053866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE FAMILY FUND HELPS FAMILIES WITH SEVERELY DISABLED OR SERIOUSLY ILL CHILDREN TO HAVE CHOICES AND THE OPPORTUNITY TO ENJOY ORDINARY LIFE. WE SUPPORT FAMILIES WITH SIGNPOSTING AND INFORMATION AND GIVE GRANTS FOR THINGS THAT MAKE LIFE EASIER AND MORE ENJOYABLE FOR THE DISABLED CHILD AND THEIR FAMILY, SUCH AS WASHING MACHINES, HOSPITAL VISITING COSTS, COMPUTERS AND FAMILY BREAKS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE FAMILY FUND (Previous name)
  • THE FAMILY FUND TRUST FOR FAMILIES WITH SEVERELY DISABLED CHILDREN (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roy Langley O'Shaughnessy Chair 29 September 2023
NATIONAL COUNCIL OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Carmen Whitelock Trustee 07 March 2025
HEART OF THE CITY OF LONDON LIMITED
Received: On time
David Bruce Cook Trustee 07 March 2025
None on record
Katherine Roberts Trustee 28 June 2024
None on record
Dr Aileen Joanne McDowell Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
Paul Andrew Bass Trustee 24 March 2023
None on record
MICHAL NOE Trustee 24 March 2023
ONE GREAT DAY
Received: On time
Ian Thomas Trustee 24 March 2023
None on record
Emma Louise Pinnock Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Shona Elizabeth Elliott Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Marguerite Leslie Josephine Haye Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Neil Andrew Ashton Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Gareth Peter Lambert Trustee 22 March 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.97m £55.41m £43.62m £46.39m £49.35m
Total expenditure £35.93m £52.97m £40.81m £44.20m £48.98m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.34m
Income from government grants £33.05m £48.13m £34.70m £33.72m £34.09m
Income - Donations and legacies £156.00k £428.00k £558.00k £384.00k £382.00k
Income - Other trading activities £2.82m £3.86m £5.03m £5.87m £6.37m
Income - Charitable activities £33.90m £51.05m £38.01m £39.89m £41.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £102.00k £29.00k £18.00k £241.00k £856.00k
Income - Other £0 £30.00k £0 £4.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £34.21m £50.94m £38.46m £41.41m £43.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.73m £2.03m £2.34m £2.79m £3.03m
Expenditure - Governance £95.00k £117.00k £131.00k £345.00k £278.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.26m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £247.00k £123.00k £304.00k £380.00k £298.00k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £15.76m £28.50m £28.16m £30.55m £27.66m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.03m -£935.00k -£292.00k -£160.00k -£25.00k
Total liabilities £9.59m £19.86m £17.53m £17.94m £14.73m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Family Fund
Unit 3
Alpha Court, Monks Cross Drive
Huntington
YORK
YO32 9WN
Phone:
01904550055