LANGTON ON SWALE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have a building - The Old School House, Kirkby Fleetham - which is let to Kirkby Fleetham C. of E. School at a peppercorn rent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 March 1996: Standard registration
- LANGTON ON SWALE EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Denis Peirson | Chair | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE MARGARET SMITH | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Garner Derek | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SAVAGE | Trustee | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY GARNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS
Area of benefit
KIRKBY FLEETHAM AND LANGTON ON SWALE AND SCRUTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOORHILLS
LUMLEY LANE
KIRKBY FLEETHAM
NORTHALLERTON
DL7 0SL
- Phone:
- 01609748335
- Email:
- rgarner545@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window