BETESDA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to contribute to running costs of old peoples' homes in Romania & other charitable enterprises on occasion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
- Romania
Governance
- 25 March 1996: Standard registration
- 26 March 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.37k | £33.45k | £46.86k | £43.25k | £41.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.91k | £31.24k | £50.25k | £41.51k | £42.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 01 November 2018 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 01 November 2018 | 1 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN ROMANIA AND IN PARTICLUAR THE ELDERLY,THE ORPHANS, THE HANDICAPPED AND THE POOR WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL,NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS IN ROMANIA
Area of benefit
ROMANIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window