BUSY BEES PLAYGROUP (BROCKWORTH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AIMS ARE TO PROVIDE A SERVICE TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING PRE-SCHOOL EDUCATION (FOLLOWING THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE )IN A HAPPY,SAFE AND RELAXED ENVIRONMNET. wE CARE FOR CHILDREN 2YEARS TO 4 YEARS OF ANY CULTURE AND OR ABILITY TO LEARN THROUGH PLAY. CHILDREN ARE ENCOURAGED BY EXAMPLE, AND LEARN TO CARE FOR AND RESPECT NOT ONLY THEMSELVES BUT ALSO OTHERS AND THEIR ENVIRONMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £80,889 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Parry | Chair | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Fullerton | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanna Trump | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gina Bizat | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Thigpen | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Lamb | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shannon O'Grady | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hailie Sturt | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Preston | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.27k | £53.83k | £42.39k | £58.81k | £93.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.35k | £50.18k | £52.35k | £55.54k | £65.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £40.25k | N/A | £38.33k | £40.46k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £47.16k | N/A | N/A | £80.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO EMBODY THE VISION OF PATA THROUGH THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY (VOLUNTARY MANAGED) GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castle Hill Primary School
Abbotswood Road
Brockworth
Gloucester
GL3 4NU
- Phone:
- 01452541183
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window