BADWELL ASH CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1054114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 December 2017 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 February 2017 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required