Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S RC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1054124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 March 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 March 2024 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 March 2024 492 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 March 2024 857 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1328 days