Trustees WE ARE BEAMS

Charity number: 1054129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Crocker Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Janette Challis Trustee 14 October 2022
3RD DARTFORD SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 28 days
Terri Cox Trustee 02 May 2019
None on record
Andrew Garrett Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record
Jason Henry Jarvis Trustee 18 April 2018
None on record
Rosemarie Neale Trustee 03 December 2013
None on record
NEIL HENRIK JOHNSTON Trustee 20 October 2011
None on record