ISLAMIC CULTURAL AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1054131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 15 May 2017 On time Download