ISLAMIC CULTURAL AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1054131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £358.39k £361.51k £327.51k £349.74k £359.73k
Total expenditure £294.09k £299.40k £324.00k £297.64k £361.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.57k £32.31k N/A N/A