NAUNTON PARK PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A non-profit, community playgroup (ages 2 - 4), based in Cheltenham, Gloucestershire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £52,389 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dror Freidman | Chair | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joe Farrag | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Vitkovich | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Kinahan | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Rogers | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dixon | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.20k | £78.69k | £98.01k | £114.10k | £88.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.43k | £83.46k | £90.81k | £97.36k | £121.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £56.81k | £57.62k | £54.57k | £63.89k | £52.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 DECEMBER 1995, AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Naunton Park Preschool Playgroup
Naunton Lane
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 7BT
- Phone:
- 01242573491
- Email:
- info@nauntonpark.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window