Financial history MAURICE DAPHNE BEQUEST (TEACHERS FUND)

Charity number: 1054213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.90k £2.88k £3.06k £3.36k £2.41k
Total expenditure £3.01k £3.09k £3.12k £3.29k £3.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A