ST BENEDICT'S COLLEGE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1054240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £35.80k £16.41k £11.97k £9.57k £1.32k
Total expenditure £3.45k £143.22k £2.28k £1.43k £320.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A