BOSLEY BOBKINS PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1054290
Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £72.97k £37.50k £44.94k £43.69k £34.77k
Total expenditure £60.03k £53.50k £49.68k £48.19k £49.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £19.95k £26.87k £28.12k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A