THE FULL GOSPEL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Religion by the proclamation and furtherance of the Gospel of God concerning His Son Jesus Christ the Lord and the preaching and teaching of the Word of God. Our priority is to continue to focus on our stated aim whilst providing financial support to Overseas Missions and to Charitable Relief Organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
- FULL GOSPEL HALL EAST HAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Percy James Jenkins | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Douglas Clarkson Williams | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Eric Amankwaa Boateng | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Olujimi Ogundele | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Valerie Robinson | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Hanan Alamy | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia John | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MR BRANFORD BOATENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
FRANCIS ATSU KUAGBELA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.90k | £59.52k | £58.60k | £93.41k | £96.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.30k | £67.64k | £110.25k | £278.49k | £184.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1993 as amended on 01 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the Church ("the Objects") are for the benefit of the public: (a) to advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council from time to time may think fit; (b) to relieve sickness and financial hardship and to promote and preserve good health by the provision of funds, goods or services of any kind including through the provision of counselling and support in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council from time to time think fit; and (c) to advance education in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council from time to time may think fit.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE EAST HAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Full Gospel Hall
91 Plashet Grove
LONDON
E6 1AA
- Phone:
- 02084716589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window