Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST PHILIP'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION SEFTON

Charity number: 1054552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 August 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 August 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required