Financial history FRIENDS OF ST PHILIP'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION SEFTON

Charity number: 1054552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £5.62k £6.87k £7.13k £3.50k £1.55k
Total expenditure £5.71k £4.18k £4.41k £2.85k £5.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A