Financial history BOX CLEVER THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1054553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £285.94k £322.44k £296.02k £268.71k £305.01k
Total expenditure £279.40k £286.98k £289.51k £317.20k £263.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £78.28k £65.45k £22.72k £68.70k
Income from government grants £31.50k £52.08k N/A N/A £146.35k