Trustees BOX CLEVER THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1054553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATE JENKINS Chair
THE MUGOMA TRUST
Received: On time
Robert Henry McCreath Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Tara Parashar Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Cath Smith Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Anna Marylka Gowlland Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
Jane Hiley Beacham Trustee 18 July 2013
None on record
RICHARD FOLEY Trustee 23 July 2012
None on record
JOHN FORSTER BROWN Trustee
DETENTION ACTION
Recently registered
MARK DAVIES Trustee
None on record
ANDREA GILLIE Trustee
None on record