Financial history ST JOHN FISHER ASSOCIATION HEAVY WOOLLEN DISTRICT

Charity number: 1054607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £15.29k £14.74k £10.55k £13.76k £9.57k
Total expenditure £15.31k £13.27k £10.41k £5.76k £5.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A