FRIENDS OF METTUPALAYAM

Charity number: 1054673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 24 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 24 April 2017 On time Download