THE SOAP AND DETERGENT INDUSTRY ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The SADIE Trust Activities are to provide funds for and general support for the benefit of the public in the United Kingdom or elsewhere including other charities and educational establishments to promote research and education into the effects of pollution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 April 1996: Standard registration
- 12 November 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE SADIE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12 | £69 | £69 | £69 | £69 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 25 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 17 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 24 August 2007 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 21 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 02 August 2005 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION OF FUNDS AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE, OF PROJECTS TO RESTORE OR REBUILD SEA WALLS, SEASHORES, RIVERBANKS AND ANY OTHER INLAND WATERWAYS, BODIES OF WATER OR COASTAL AREAS INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION PROJECTS FOR THE RESTORATION OF AREAS OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL BEAUTY OR SPECIAL SCIENTIFIC INTEREST VULNERABLE TO THE EFFECTS OF POLLUTION (B) THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OR FIELDS OF RESTORATION OR REBUILDING OF SEAWALLS, SEASHORES, RIVERBANKS AND ANY OTHER INLAND WATERWAYS, BODIES OF WATER OR COASTAL AREAS INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION PROJECTS FOR THE RESTORATION OF AREAS OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL BEAUTY OR SPECIAL SCIENTIFIC INTEREST VULNERABLE TO THE EFFECTS OF POLLUTION. (C) THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE OF OTHER CHARITIES AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS INVOLVED IN THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TO THE EXTENT THAT THESE ARE APPLIED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (D) THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window