Financial history THE PRINCESS ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1054745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £924.00k £747.00k £844.00k £686.56k £404.29k
Total expenditure £779.00k £880.00k £657.00k £700.35k £272.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £289.00k £211.00k £326.00k £198.10k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £634.00k £535.00k £515.00k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £484.62k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.00k £1.00k £3.00k £3.84k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £18.00k £0 £175.00k £31.36k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £524.00k £582.00k £413.00k £473.31k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £255.00k £298.00k £244.00k £227.04k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.00k £4.00k £3.50k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £431.00k £579.00k £0 £454.92k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A