Financial history HARROW CLUB

Charity number: 1054757
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £852.20k £1.22m £1.01m £1.38m £1.54m
Total expenditure £794.99k £888.95k £1.13m £1.11m £1.44m
Income from government contracts £141.00k N/A N/A £166.19k £248.15k
Income from government grants £40.97k £193.79k £253.02k £376.42k £366.99k
Income - Donations and legacies £692.55k £454.85k £786.78k £1.37m £354.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £112.76k £9.93k £0
Income - Charitable activities £18.47k £147.77k £112.47k £0 £81.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £301 £91 £34
Income - Other £141.18k £617.23k £0 £0 £1.10m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £794.99k £790.66k £1.05m £1.06m £1.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £98.30k £77.38k £46.51k £40.21k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.20k £0 £3.50k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0